Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillus Raymond Umoh

Bishop of Ikot Ekpene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1956 BornNto Iblam, Okon Clan
7 Jul 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
16 Jul 201053.9AppointedBishop of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
9 Oct 201054.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Camillus Raymond Umoh:
Bishop Camillus Raymond Umoh (born ) Bishop of Ikot Ekpene

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ikot Ekpene.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015