Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epifanio Maria Turrisi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Flavias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1769BornTusa, Italy
20 Feb 179627.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 183869.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
14 Oct 183869.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias

MicroData Summary for Epifanio Maria Turrisi
Bishop Epifanio Maria Turrisi (born ) Titular Bishop of Flavias

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 195
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016