Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Torres, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹Born
3 Jan 164451.0SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
18 Apr 164451.2ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
24 Apr 164451.3Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
1645¹52.0DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Torres
Bishop Miguel de Torres O.P. (born 1593, died 1645) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 25
  • ob/c2: AT, 14 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018