Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuliano Tommasuolo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Hephaestus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1842BornNapoli
6 Dec 190664.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
6 Dec 190664.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
16 Dec 190664.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
19 Jul 191876.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Tommasuolo:
Bishop Giuliano Tommasuolo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015