Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Tisbia, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1625Born
16 Nov 167146.1AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
22 Nov 167146.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
25 Apr 169367.6DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Tisbia
Bishop Luca Tisbia C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Trevico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuccino (Conza)

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1671, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018