Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Tiberi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1773BornContigliano
2 Oct 182653.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
Dec 1826³53.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 182653.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
9 Jan 182754.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
30 Sep 183158.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183259.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Jesi, Italy
2 Jul 183259.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Aug 183461.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
18 May 183663.3ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
28 Oct 183966.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tiberi (VIAF: 89530217)
Francesco Cardinal Tiberi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

  • a priest for 12.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 61, and Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jun 2016