Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Arcangelo Del Forno

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1763BornCava
22 Dec 178724.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182763.2SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
9 Apr 182763.4ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
16 Apr 182763.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
1 May 182763.4InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Mar 183066.3ResignedBishop of Trivento, Italy
19 Sep 183571.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Arcangelo Del Forno:
Bishop Michele Arcangelo Del Forno (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivento

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013