Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Taranco Mujaurrieta

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1688³BornCastro Urdiales
24 Sep 171224.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 173647.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
27 Feb 173647.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
Jul 1736³47.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
8 Mar 174556.5AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
3 Feb 175667.4DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Taranco Mujaurrieta:
Bishop Lorenzo Taranco Mujaurrieta (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 54, Number 238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108, and Page 225
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015