Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Stagno

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1746Born
16 Mar 177124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
29 Jan 178740.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
29 Jan 178740.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
19 Mar 178740.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
31 Mar 180154.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Stagno
Bishop Guglielmo Stagno (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 395
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,702
  • tdio: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast