Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Spoto

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1729Born
9 Aug 180273.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
21 Sep 180273.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
28 May 180474.9ConfirmedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
29 Dec 180879.5DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Spoto
Bishop Domenico Spoto (born , died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Angelo Muxaro

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1802, Number 73
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,219
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145, and Page 241
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018