Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Spinelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1751BornNapoli
28 May 177422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Mar 181866.5SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
6 Apr 181866.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
12 Apr 181866.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
23 Oct 182473.1DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Spinelli:
Archbishop Michele Spinelli C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013