Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikola Spanic

Deceased

Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹Born
6 Apr 165825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
17 Jul 167340.5AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
23 Jul 167340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
29 Nov 170774.9DiedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikola Spanic
Bishop Nikola Spanic (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurzola, Diocese of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Apr 2018