Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vjenceslav Šoić

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Lorea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1814Born
19 Mar 183924.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 183924.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185844.2AppointedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 Feb 185944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
15 Jan 186146.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
8 Jan 186954.2SucceededBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
21 Sep 187560.9ResignedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
26 Oct 187561.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorea
11 Jan 189176.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vjenceslav Šoić (VIAF: 305761637)
Bishop Vjenceslav Šoić (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senj (-Modruš)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBakar
Ordained BishopCathedral, Senj, Diocese of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 145, and Page 348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 509
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017