Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Liévin-Joseph Sion, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kontum, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Midaëum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1890Born
20 Mar 192029.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Dec 194151.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kontum, Viet Nam
23 Dec 194151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Midaëum
22 Apr 194251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midaëum
19 Aug 195161.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Liévin-Joseph Sion
Bishop Jean-Liévin-Joseph Sion M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kontum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstaires, France

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,942, Number 20
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951, Page 545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast