Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice de Siena

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1846Born
18 Sep 186923.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 189851.9AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
25 Mar 189852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
26 Jan 190255.8DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice de Siena
Bishop Felice de Siena (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaddaloni, Diocese of Caserta
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 169
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,754
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017