Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Serarcangeli

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1827Born
30 Mar 185022.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 187952.2AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
28 Sep 187952.2Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
14 Feb 188860.6DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Serarcangeli (VIAF: 89434297)
Bishop Vincenzo Serarcangeli (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino, Archdiocese of Camerino
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017