Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Schrott

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1791³BornNovigrad
19 Mar 181322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 181322.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 183645.6SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
19 May 183746.2ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
22 Apr 183847.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
6 Apr 185766.1DiedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Schrott (VIAF: 299534984)
Bishop Josip Schrott (born , died ) Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016