Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salerno

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607²BornRome
15 Sep 164235.7AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
26 Oct 164235.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
7 Oct 164740.7Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 164740.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
1 Apr 165851.2ResignedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
26 Feb 165952.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Savelli:
Fabrizio Cardinal Savelli (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salerno

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015