Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gonzaga, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
21 Feb 163331.1AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
17 Dec 165755.9AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
18 Dec 167371.9DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gonzaga:
Bishop Francesco Gonzaga C.R. (died ) Bishop of Nola

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 260, and Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015