Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Santacolomba

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

Titular Bishop of Anemurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1725BornPalermo
14 Mar 175025.2Ordained PriestPriest
178055.0AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
19 Dec 178561.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
2 Apr 178661.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
13 Jul 180176.5DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Santacolomba:
Bishop Carlo Santacolomba (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013