Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Rubio-Benedicto Herrero

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1725Born
30 Mar 177852.5AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
10 May 177852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
21 Feb 179468.4AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
27 May 179569.6DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rubio-Benedicto Herrero
Bishop Pedro Rubio-Benedicto Herrero (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta María del Campo Rus

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 94, Number 486
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast