Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-Louis de Rougé

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1729¹Born
15 Dec 177142.9SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
30 Mar 177243.2ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
26 Apr 177243.3Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
Nov 1772³43.8DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Louis de Rougé:
Bishop Gabriel-Louis de Rougé (born 1729, died Nov 1772) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,601
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Dec 2015