Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (IV)

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1641BornMünster
30 Nov 166423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Aug 167231.4SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
26 Jun 167332.2ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 Jan 167432.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
20 May 170160.1DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Adrian von Riedmatten (IV):
Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (IV) (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013