Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Révol

Deceased

Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1716BornTerrebasse
2 Apr 174226.1SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
9 Jul 174226.4ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
5 Aug 174226.5Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
25 Apr 178367.2DiedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

MicroData Summary for François de Révol:
Bishop François de Révol (born , died ) Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015