Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Raimundi

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1671Born
18 Sep 169422.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172655.2AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
29 Dec 172655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
22 Sep 173261.0DiedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Raimundi
Bishop Marco Antonio Raimundi (born , died ) Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutri

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast