Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Portanova

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1759BornNapoli
1783¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181858.9SelectedBishop of Lucera, Italy
6 Apr 181859.0ConfirmedBishop of Lucera, Italy
12 Apr 181859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
12 Jul 184081.2DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Portanova
Bishop Andrea Portanova (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 May 2016