Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille-Louis-Apollinaire de Polignac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1745BornParis
28 Feb 177933.4SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
12 Jul 177933.8ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
8 Aug 177933.9Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
10 Nov 180156.1ResignedBishop of Meaux, France
27 Oct 182176.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Camille-Louis-Apollinaire de Polignac:
Bishop Camille-Louis-Apollinaire de Polignac (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015