Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Planeta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1794Born
21 Sep 181622.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 184147.2SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
15 Jul 184147.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
Oct 1841³47.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
22 Dec 184955.9ResignedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
7 Jan 185055.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
5 Jun 185864.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Planeta
Archbishop Diego Planeta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSambuca di Sicilia

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 238
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 119
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1841, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018