Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Pistocchi

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1831Born
9 Oct 185322.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 187948.6AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
28 Sep 187948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
31 Mar 188352.1DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Pistocchi
Bishop Aloysius Pistocchi (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesenatico, Diocese of Cesena
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017