Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimiro Piñera y Naredo

Deceased

Prelate of Ciudad Real, Spain

Titular Bishop of Dora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1837Born
6 Mar 189658.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain
6 Mar 189658.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Anchialus
24 May 189658.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anchialus
28 Nov 189861.3AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
28 Nov 189861.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
28 Aug 190467.0DiedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Piñera y Naredo (VIAF: 87454286)
Bishop Casimiro Piñera y Naredo (born , died ) Prelate of Ciudad Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaso, Territorial Prelature of Ciudad Real
Ordained BishopCiudad Real, Territorial Prelature of Ciudad Real

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 140
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017