Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Augusto Peruzzini, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1710BornFossombrone
22 Nov 172616.6ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
21 Mar 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
20 Sep 175646.4AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
3 Oct 175646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
11 Jan 177766.7DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Augusto Peruzzini:
Bishop Carlo Augusto Peruzzini B. (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013