Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cipriano Pavoni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹Born
20 Nov 161940.9AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
8 Dec 161940.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
6 Mar 162748.2DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cipriano Pavoni:
Bishop Cipriano Pavoni O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 95
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 67, Number 388
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Mar 2014