Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Elvezio Pagliari

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1834Born
19 Dec 185723.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187944.4AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
9 Mar 187944.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
5 Feb 190065.4DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Elvezio Pagliari (VIAF: 89262114)
Archbishop Mariano Elvezio Pagliari (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino, Archdiocese of Camerino
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 527
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017