Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Padula

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1842Born
1867¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 189856.0AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
25 Mar 189856.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
2 Aug 190866.3AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
18 Nov 192886.6DiedBishop of Avellino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Padula (VIAF: 260756848)
Bishop Giuseppe Padula (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotenza, Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 156
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jun 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,753
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017