Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fargal O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1741²Born
16 Jan 180766.0AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
24 Aug 180766.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
30 Apr 182988.3DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fargal O’Reilly
Bishop Fargal O’Reilly (born 1741, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmore, Diocese of Kilmore
Death PlaceDiocese of Kilmore
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick's churchyard, Moybolge

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 Sep 2020

Quantcast