Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Olivera y Pardo

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1662³BornHacienda de Aleman
26 Feb 171451.5AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
27 Dec 171452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
10 Jul 173370.9DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Olivera y Pardo:
Bishop Jacinto Olivera y Pardo (born Aug 1662, died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,381
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,638
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015