Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Olivadisi

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹BornCathacen
16 Nov 162640.9AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
30 Nov 162640.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
20 Sep 162741.7AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
16 Jul 164660.5AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
10 Nov 1656³70.9DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Olivadisi:
Bishop Fabio Olivadisi (died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 217, and Page 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 141
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 88, Number 522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013