Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modernus (Fabrizio) Caracciolo Piscizi

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹BornNapoli
22 Dec 160421.9AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
30 Jan 160926.0ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
7 Jan 161936.0AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
Feb 1619³36.0Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
7 Nov 162946.8ResignedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
28 Jan 163047.0AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
1631¹48.0DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Modernus (Fabrizio) Caracciolo Piscizi
Bishop Modernus (Fabrizio) Caracciolo Piscizi (born 1583, died 1631) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 264, and Page 141
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 3
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016