Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1755¹Born
4 Jan 178833.0AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
Apr 178833.3Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
18 Feb 180348.1DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Connor:
Bishop Thomas O’Connor (died ) Bishop of Achonry

  • a bishop for 14.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Dec 2014