Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Nanni, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1749BornAvezzano
24 Jun 177122.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
5 Jun 177324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
Jun 1805³56.1SelectedBishop of Teramo, Italy
26 Jun 180556.2ConfirmedBishop of Teramo, Italy
30 Jun 180556.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
8 Mar 182272.9ResignedBishop of Teramo, Italy
29 Dec 182273.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Nanni:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Nanni C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teramo

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013