Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Naaman, M.S.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1911BornDamas
15 Aug 193726.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 196756.1AppointedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
8 Oct 196756.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
20 Aug 198271.1DiedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Naaman:
Archbishop Nicolas Naaman M.S.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bosra e Haūrān

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015