Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Achkar

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1893Born
15 Aug 192128.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 196168.6SelectedArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
11 Nov 196168.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Dec 196168.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
18 Aug 198188.5RetiredArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
23 Apr 198289.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Paul Achkar
Archbishop Paul Achkar (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018