Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Mulvany

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1868Born
6 Mar 189224.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 192961.1AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
30 Jun 192961.3Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
16 Jun 194375.2DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Mulvany
Bishop Thomas Mulvany (born , died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoynalty

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018