Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofrio Montesoro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1647Born
2 Feb 168941.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Feb 168941.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 169649.5AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
21 Dec 169649.5Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
24 Dec 172275.5ResignedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Onofrio Montesoro
Bishop Onofrio Montesoro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast