Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fintan Monahan

Bishop of Killaloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1967 BornTullamore
16 Jun 199124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
29 Jul 201649.5AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
25 Sep 201649.6Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Fintan Monahan
Bishop Fintan Monahan (born ) Bishop of Killaloe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Killaloe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2016
  • ob: CB, 30 Jul 2016
  • c2+: CB, 13 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016