Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh MacMullan

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1723²Born
1760¹37.0Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
11 Aug 177956.6AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
8 Oct 179471.7DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh MacMullan
Bishop Hugh MacMullan (born 1723, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallynanny, Co. Down
Death PlaceErynagh
Buried Place (Original)Old, Cemetery, Clonduff

  • a priest for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202
  • bd/dp: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • bd/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast