Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Milletich (Miletic), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae

Titular Bishop of Daulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1762¹BornFojniczae
6 Mar 180341.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
15 Mar 180341.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae, Croatia
12 Jun 180341.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
1 Mar 181351.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae, Croatia
18 Jul 183169.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae, Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Milletich (Miletic):
Bishop Augustin Milletich (Miletic) O.F.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bosniae Othomanae

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013