Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donal McKeown

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1950 Born
3 Jul 197727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Feb 200150.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Feb 200150.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cell Ausaille
29 Apr 200151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cell Ausaille
25 Feb 201463.8AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
6 Apr 201463.9InstalledBishop of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Donal McKeown
Bishop Donal McKeown (born ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRandalstown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Derry.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,969
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2014
  • i: CB, 28 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018