Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas McDonnell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1912Born
23 Jun 193724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Killala, Ireland
12 Oct 197057.9AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
13 Dec 197058.0Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
21 Jan 198774.2RetiredBishop of Killala, Ireland
9 Dec 198775.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Killala, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas McDonnell
Bishop Thomas McDonnell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallycastle

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast