Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Mazzei

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1761BornFuscaldo
11 Mar 178624.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 181957.8SelectedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
27 Sep 181957.8ConfirmedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
29 Sep 181957.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
16 Feb 182361.2DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Mazzei
Bishop Pasquale Mazzei (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1819, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 May 2016